Japanese multiplication maths trick. How to multiply two numbers together using a simple visual lines diagram technique. Perfect to help anyone struggling with arithmetic.

Larger numbers can also be calculated using the same principle if you follow the same rules.

Other Videos:
Pack for 1 night –
Office supplies crossbow:
Serve a watermelon
Amazing floating cube:

Music: Deliberate Thought – Kevin MacLeod (incompetech.com)

This is equivalent to the standard method we learn at primary school. To see why, use larger digits like 89 x 78 and notice that, instead of counting intersections, you'll be multiplying digits, carrying and adding the carry to the next column – just like you do in the standard method. The difference is the standard method is quicker. It is quicker to write the digit '9' than it is to draw nine lines.

Great video, very visual and clear to understand. I attempted to use this method with higher digits (i.e 38 x 29) and got completely lost at where to separate the zones with so many lines all over the place ๐

Very good methodology

Bayot og tingog

This is equivalent to the standard method we learn at primary school. To see why, use larger digits like 89 x 78 and notice that, instead of counting intersections, you'll be multiplying digits, carrying and adding the carry to the next column – just like you do in the standard method. The difference is the standard method is quicker. It is quicker to write the digit '9' than it is to draw nine lines.

Japanese multiplication is easy, I thought It's going to be hard

Use the column method!

Easy multiplication tricks here

https://youtu.be/dZuwtR90hVw

๐๐ โ๐ฆ๐๐๐๐ฃrrr ๐ฃ ๐๐๐ธ๐๐๐ ๐ฉ๐ค ๐๐ถ๐๐พ๐ป๐๐๐ ๐ฎ๐ค๐ช๐ง dream ๐๐๐๐ ๐๐ > >>https://t.co/iwLrU6RZzP?ZmXgLAKaT1ks ๐๐ 2093

Nice trick, thank you ๐

What about about a number like 75×57 would that work with this method

super duper method

Witchcraft

I donโt need this I already know how to multiply

See 32×12= 44

Useful not Useless

I prefer the basic method. ๐๐ This one's hard for me especially when I'm doing an oral one I can't image this one with big numbers.๐คฆ

Great video, very visual and clear to understand. I attempted to use this method with higher digits (i.e 38 x 29) and got completely lost at where to separate the zones with so many lines all over the place ๐

Its maya method…. idiot…

multiply 16*21 by the same version

Why are you not a teacher?

I'm not going thru all that!!!

How about 3367*9786. That, you cant multiply fast.

wow Thank YOU VERRRRy much

this will be helpful for my first

day of Grade 4

Normal multiplication is far better.

thank you i find it very intersting.

I've been struggling when I got to when one of my digits were ten. What do I do then?

What if answer is 4 digit

You count too fast. Makes me feel weird.

why did you say "if you want to see more useless tricks" at the end of the video? LOL

When zero comes than what will be heppened.

4:02 But if you liked this video and want to see more useless tricks, click on the links on the righthand side

Quick maths

Mind blown

Not useless my friend but actually very functional for those of us that see and interface with the world visually. Thanks for the video I loved it.

I am lost for words. This is too mind-blowing!!!

Primitive calculator!! AWESOME!

Awesome info

Quick maths

this is so mind-blowing!!!

subscribe my chanel plzzz

you are the best thankyou so much this tip really helped me!๐๐

What should we do if there is zero???

It's not pretty cool, it's pretty lengthy๐๐๐

hackerWhat if I get a two digit number in the last zone ?

WOW

Very very thanks

That's amazing๐ฅ๐ฅ

Very simple … & so is the chinese method.

Very good

Sir if we have a number of zeros like 50*20 so how can we solve it

์ด๋ป๊ฒํ๋ ธ ์จ๋ฐใน๋ จ์ ใทใท

์ด๋ฐ ๋์์ด๊ฐ์ ๊ณ์ฐ๋ฒ์ ๋ญ์งใ ใ ใ

์ถฉ๊ฒฉ์ ์ด๋ค